Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerolamo Formagliari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Todi

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1700BornBologna
26 May 173635.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 174646.3AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
4 Dec 174646.3Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
6 Jun 176059.8ResignedBishop of Todi, Italy
21 Jul 176059.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
1781¹80.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Formagliari:
Archbishop Gerolamo Formagliari (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Todi

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 82, and Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013