Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Bozzoni

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1700BornNapoli
10 Jun 172423.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 174948.2AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
9 Mar 174948.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
21 Dec 174949.0DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Bozzoni:
Bishop Domenico Bozzoni (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015