Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Bonaiuti

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1704³BornPreci
19 May 174238.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 174743.2AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
4 Jun 174743.2Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
27 Feb 176560.9DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Bonaiuti:
Bishop Sebastiano Bonaiuti (born , died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

  • a priest for 22.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015