Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Franci

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1705BornGrosseto
4 Nov 172924.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 173731.8AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
12 May 173731.8Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
10 Apr 179084.7DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Franci:
Bishop Antonio Maria Franci (born , died ) Bishop of Grosseto

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 52.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013