Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maria Callist Soosa Pakiam

Archbishop of Trivandrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1946 BornMarthandonthura
20 Dec 196923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Trivandrum, India
10 Nov 198943.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trivandrum, India
2 Feb 199043.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Trivandrum, India
31 Jan 199144.9SucceededBishop of Trivandrum, India
17 Jun 200458.3AppointedArchbishop of Trivandrum, India
23 Aug 200458.4InstalledArchbishop of Trivandrum, India

MicroData Summary for Maria Callist Soosa Pakiam:
Archbishop Maria Callist Soosa Pakiam (born ) Archbishop of Trivandrum

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Trivandrum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,957

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 23 Feb 2014