Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Athipozhiyil

Bishop Emeritus of Alleppey, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1944 Born
5 Oct 196925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Alleppey, India
16 Nov 200056.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alleppey, India
11 Feb 200156.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Alleppey, India
9 Dec 200157.5SucceededBishop of Alleppey, India
11 Oct 201975.3RetiredBishop of Alleppey, India

MicroData Summary for Stephen Athipozhiyil
Bishop Stephen Athipozhiyil (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Alleppey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChennavely
Ordained BishopMount Carmel, Cathedral, Alleppey, Diocese of Alleppey

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alleppey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,904
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 11 Oct 2019

Quantcast