Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Selvister Ponnumuthan

Bishop of Punalur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1956 BornViraly-Utchakkada
19 Dec 198125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trivandrum, India
14 Jun 199639.8IncardinatedPriest of Neyyattinkara, India
8 May 200952.7AppointedBishop of Punalur, India
28 Jun 200952.9Ordained BishopBishop of Punalur, India

MicroData Summary for Selvister Ponnumuthan:
Bishop Selvister Ponnumuthan (born ) Bishop of Punalur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Punalur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013