Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ruiz-Cabal y Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona

Titular Bishop of Lystra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1835BornVillamartín
1860¹24.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 188650.7AppointedBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
22 Aug 188650.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
11 Nov 1899³64.1ResignedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
14 Dec 189964.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
14 Nov 190873.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ruiz-Cabal y Rodríguez:
Bishop Antonio Ruiz-Cabal y Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 357, and Page 436

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013