Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonino Sardi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anagni, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1849Born
19 Dec 187425.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 189444.5AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
3 Jun 189444.6Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
8 Jul 191262.7ResignedBishop of Anagni, Italy
8 Jul 191262.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
16 Feb 191767.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonino Sardi (VIAF: 304921692)
Archbishop Antonino Sardi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Anagni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSulmona, Diocese of Valva e Sulmona
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,894, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast