Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sebastiano Cardinal Martinelli, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

Apostolic Delegate to United States of America


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1848Born
6 Dec 186315.2EnteredMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
6 Jan 186516.3ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
4 Mar 187122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1889²40.3AppointedPrior General of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
18 Aug 189647.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
18 Aug 189647.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
30 Aug 189648.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
4 Oct 189648.1InstalledApostolic Delegate to United States of America
1898²49.3CeasedPrior General of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
15 Apr 190152.6Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 190253.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
8 Feb 190960.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
4 Jul 191869.8DiedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Martinelli (VIAF: 260194893)
Sebastiano Cardinal Martinelli O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Prefect of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorgo Sant’Anna, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Agostino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAugustinian House of Sant'Anna, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Augustinian mausoleum, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
  • a cardinal for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 261, and Page 46
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1896, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017