Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Laurenzi

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1821Born
23 Sep 184322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Perugia, Italy
22 Jun 187756.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perugia, Italy
22 Jun 187756.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
24 Jun 187756.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
13 Dec 188059.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
10 Nov 188463.8Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 188463.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
25 Apr 188564.2AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Feb 188968.0AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
14 Mar 188968.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
3 Oct 188968.7ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
2 Nov 189372.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

MicroData Summary for Carlo Laurenzi (VIAF: 89149602)
Carlo Cardinal Laurenzi (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Crisogono, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Propaganda Fide Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
  • a cardinal for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 93, and Page 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Dec 1880
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017