Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Gómez-Salazar y Lucio-Villegas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1827Born
1854²26.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 188658.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
22 Aug 188659.1Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
1 Oct 190477.2RetiredBishop of León, Spain
13 Mar 190678.6DiedBishop Emeritus of León, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gómez-Salazar y Lucio-Villegas
Bishop Francisco Gómez-Salazar y Lucio-Villegas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArijas, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopGongoras, Madrid

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017