Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal Lorenzelli

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1853Born
1 Apr 187622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
30 May 189340.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
1 Oct 189643.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
30 Nov 189643.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
8 Dec 189643.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sardes
19 May 189946.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
31 Jul 190451.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
14 Nov 190451.5AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
15 Apr 190753.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190753.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
26 Mar 191056.8ResignedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
13 Feb 191460.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
15 Sep 191562.3DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Lorenzelli (VIAF: 13245619)
Benedetto Cardinal Lorenzelli (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBadi di Castel di Casio, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy
Ordained PriestBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVilla, Bucciano, Diocese of San Miniato, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady of Sorrows chapel, Cathedral, San Miniato, Diocese of San Miniato, Italy

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
  • a cardinal for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 501
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017