Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Bacilieri

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1842Born
17 Dec 186422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
1 Jun 188846.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Verona, Italy
1 Jun 188846.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
10 Jun 188846.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
12 Mar 190057.9SucceededBishop of Verona, Italy
15 Apr 190159.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190159.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
14 Feb 192380.8DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Bacilieri (VIAF: 255043896)
Bartolomeo Cardinal Bacilieri (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreonio, Diocese of Verona
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopAlmo Collegio Capranica, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona
Buried Place (Original)tomb of the canons of the cathedral chapter, Cemetery, Verona, Diocese of Verona
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Verona, Diocese of Verona

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
  • a cardinal for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 422, and Page 587
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1888, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017