Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo (Alexander) Ghezzi, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1842Born
23 Sep 186523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
29 Nov 189553.1AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
12 Jan 189653.3Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
26 Jan 192077.3DiedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo (Alexander) Ghezzi (VIAF: 88813858)
Bishop Giacomo (Alexander) Ghezzi O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel Madama, Diocese of Tivoli
Ordained BishopAra Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1896, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017