Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Ponzi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Sardes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1830Born
20 Dec 185626.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 189463.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
27 May 189463.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
18 Mar 189564.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
8 Apr 189665.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Sardes

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ponzi
Archbishop Giovanni Ponzi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Sardes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCapranica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 382, and Page 501
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1894, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017