Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Sardi di Rivisondoli

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Constantinople

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1855BornSulmona
18 Dec 188227.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 190852.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
10 Apr 190852.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
10 May 190852.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
10 Jun 1914³58.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
11 Aug 192064.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Constantinople, Turkey

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Sardi di Rivisondoli:
Archbishop Vincenzo Sardi di Rivisondoli (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Constantinople

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 31
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013