Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aristide Cardinal Rinaldini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1844Born
6 Jun 186824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Aug 188743.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
Jan 189146.9AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Luxembourg
31 May 189349.3AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
14 Aug 189652.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
14 Aug 189652.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
30 Aug 189652.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
7 Nov 189955.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
15 Apr 190763.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Apr 190763.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
19 Dec 190763.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
10 Feb 192076.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio

MicroData Summary for Aristide Rinaldini (VIAF: 315694566)
Aristide Cardinal Rinaldini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefalco, Archdiocese of Spoleto, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Agostino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's Basilica Chapter Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
  • a cardinal for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 302
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 51
  • xsta/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 33, and Page 34, and Page 65
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 169, and Page 185, and Page 186
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 239, and Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast