Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Boyce, O.C.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Raphoe, Ireland

Apostolic Administrator of Dromore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1940 Born
1959²18.9First VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
17 Apr 196626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
29 Jun 199555.4AppointedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
1 Oct 199555.6Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
9 Jun 201777.3RetiredBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
26 Mar 201878.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Dromore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip Boyce (VIAF: 267468596)
Bishop Philip Boyce O.C.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Raphoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDownings
Ordained BishopSt. Eunan and St. Columba, Cathedral, Letterkenny, Diocese of Raphoe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Raphoe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,616
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jul 2018

Quantcast