Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip George Scher

Deceased

Bishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1880Born
6 Jun 190323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
28 Apr 193353.1AppointedBishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
29 Jun 193353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
3 Jan 195372.8DiedBishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Philip George Scher
Bishop Philip George Scher (born , died ) Bishop of Monterey-Fresno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelleville, IL

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast