Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Robert Johnson

Deceased

Bishop of Orange in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1918Born
28 May 194425.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 197152.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
19 Feb 197152.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Blera
25 Mar 197152.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Blera
24 Mar 197657.3AppointedBishop of Orange in California, USA
28 Jul 198667.6DiedBishop of Orange in California, USA

MicroData Summary for William Robert Johnson
Bishop William Robert Johnson (born , died ) Bishop of Orange in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTonopah, NV

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast