Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John James Ward

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California

Titular Bishop of California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1920BornLos Angeles
4 May 194625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
16 Oct 196343.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
16 Oct 196343.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bria
12 Dec 196343.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bria
7 May 199675.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
15 Jun 199675.7AppointedTitular Bishop of California
10 Jan 201190.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for John James Ward
Bishop John James Ward (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Jun 2016