Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clarence Richard Silva

Bishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1949 Born
2 May 197525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oakland, California, USA
17 May 200555.7AppointedBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
21 Jul 200555.9Ordained BishopBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA

MicroData Summary for Clarence Richard Silva
Bishop Clarence Richard Silva (born ) Bishop of Honolulu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHonolulu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Honolulu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,947

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast