Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Vincenzo Cardinal Bonzano

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to United States of America

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1867BornCastelletto Scazzoso, Italy
21 May 189022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
2 Feb 191244.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
3 Feb 191244.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
3 Mar 191244.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Melitene
11 Dec 192255.2Elevated to Cardinal
11 Dec 192255.2ResignedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
14 Dec 192255.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
18 Dec 192457.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
26 Nov 192760.1DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to United States of America

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vincenzo Bonzano:
Giovanni Vincenzo Cardinal Bonzano (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of United States of America

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
  • a cardinal for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1912, Number 14
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015