Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tucson

Dioecesis Tucsonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 8 May 1897
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Santa Fe
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Arizona
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 108,738 (42,707 Square Miles)
  • Description: La Paz, Yuma, Pinal, Gila, Graham, Greenlee, Santa Cruz, Cochise, and Pima Counties in Arizona
  • Conference Region: XIII (AZ, CO, NM, UT, WY)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: TUC
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesetucson.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 111 S. Church Ave., Tucson, AZ 85701-0031
  • Telephone: (520)792-3410
  • Fax: 792-0291

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Arizona
1868ErectedDiocese of Santa Fe Vicariate Apostolic of Arizona (erected)
1891Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Arizona (El Paso County in Texas) Diocese of Dallas
Diocese of Tucson
8 May 1897ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Arizona (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese) Diocese of Tucson (erected)
3 March 1914Territory LostDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Tucson
Diocese of El Paso (erected)
16 December 1939Territory LostArchdiocese of Santa Fe
Diocese of Tucson
Diocese of Gallup (erected)
28 June 1969Territory LostDiocese of Tucson Diocese of Phoenix (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tucson
1950200,000628,73331.8%62641261,5876432553ap1951
1966412,0001,487,00027.7%1471492961,39114964187ap1967
1970136,356588,00023.2%1101101,23950ap1971
1976185,000765,90024.2%107942019201410136956ap1977
1980198,000862,20023.0%11588203975629834856ap1981
1990294,3991,038,20028.4%129802091,408589432063ap1991
1999335,5201,307,41225.7%113691821,843127827664ap2000
2000300,4231,451,47720.7%135692041,4721247827471ap2001
2001304,0601,348,37122.6%133661991,5271247625071ap2002
2002330,6171,452,27122.8%153682211,4961247723970ap2003
2003350,1021,523,85123.0%147672141,6351207724373ap2004
2004350,0001,517,42823.1%155722271,5411437923872ap2005
2010382,1231,689,67622.6%137772141,78514210220875ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 19 Sep 2012