Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Jacques (Johann Jakob) Lantz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

Titular Bishop of Dora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1720Born
3 Apr 178666.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
3 Apr 178666.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
14 May 178666.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
6 Jan 179978.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Jacques (Johann Jakob) Lantz
Bishop Jean Jacques (Johann Jakob) Lantz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchlettstadt

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 200, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast