Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jacques-Guillaume-René-François Prudhomme de la Boussinière des Vallées] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Sarthe (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1728Born
17 Feb 179162.1SelectedBishop of [Sarthe (Constitutional), France]
13 Mar 179162.2Ordained BishopBishop of [Sarthe (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³72.7ResignedBishop of [Sarthe (Constitutional), France]
9 Feb 181283.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Sarthe (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Guillaume-René-François Prudhomme de la Boussinière des Vallées (VIAF: 295556545)
Bishop Jacques-Guillaume-René-François Prudhomme de la Boussinière des Vallées (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sarthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Christophe-en-Champagne
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceBrains-sur-Gée

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast