Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Saurine

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1733Born
16 Feb 179157.9SelectedBishop of [Landes (Constitutional), France]
27 Feb 179157.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Landes (Constitutional), France]
1801²67.8ResignedBishop of [Landes (Constitutional), France]
9 Apr 180269.0SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
29 Apr 180269.1ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
9 May 181380.1DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Saurine
Bishop Jean-Pierre Saurine (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pierre d'Eysey
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceSoulz

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Oct 2018

Quantcast