Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Gabriel Deville] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Pyrénées-Orientales (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1749²Born
31 Jan 179142.0SelectedBishop of [Pyrénées-Orientales (Constitutional), France]
26 Apr 179142.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Pyrénées-Orientales (Constitutional), France]
27 Nov 179344.9ResignedBishop of [Pyrénées-Orientales (Constitutional), France]
17 May 179647.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Pyrénées-Orientales (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Deville (VIAF: 49333548)
Bishop Gabriel Deville (born 1749, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pyrénées-Orientales

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLatour de France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceLatour de France

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 13 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Oct 2018

Quantcast