Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean Julien Avoine] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Seine-et-Oise (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1741Born
7 Dec 179049.2SelectedBishop of [Seine-et-Oise (Constitutional), France]
27 Mar 179149.5Ordained BishopBishop of [Seine-et-Oise (Constitutional), France]
3 Nov 179352.1DiedBishop of [Seine-et-Oise (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Jean Julien Avoine (VIAF: 29642059)
Bishop Jean Julien Avoine (born , died ) Bishop of Seine-et-Oise

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHavre
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceVersailles

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Oct 2018

Quantcast