Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Charles Bonnet] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Eure-et-Loir (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1721Born
20 Mar 179169.8SelectedBishop of [Eure-et-Loir (Constitutional), France]
27 Mar 179169.8Ordained BishopBishop of [Eure-et-Loir (Constitutional), France]
13 Nov 179372.4DiedBishop of [Eure-et-Loir (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Charles Bonnet
Bishop Charles Bonnet (born , died ) Bishop of Eure-et-Loir

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTréon
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceChartres

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,791, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast