Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop René Héraudin] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Indre (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1722Born
6 Feb 179169.0SelectedBishop of [Indre (Constitutional), France]
6 Mar 179169.0Ordained BishopBishop of [Indre (Constitutional), France]
28 Nov 179371.8ResignedBishop of [Indre (Constitutional), France]
9 Mar 180078.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Indre (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for René Héraudin
Bishop René Héraudin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Indre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlanc
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceValencay, [Constitutional Diocese of Indre]

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast