Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Baptiste Massieu] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Oise (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1743Born
23 Feb 179147.4SelectedBishop of [Oise (Constitutional), France]
6 Mar 179147.4Ordained BishopBishop of [Oise (Constitutional), France]
1793²49.2ResignedBishop of [Oise (Constitutional), France]
6 Jun 181874.7DiedBishop Emeritus of [Oise (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Massieu (VIAF: 49334416)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Massieu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oise

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVernon
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceBruxelles

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast