Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Marie Jacob] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Côtes-du-Nord (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1741Born
14 Mar 179149.5SelectedBishop of [Côtes-du-Nord (Constitutional), France]
1 May 179149.6Ordained BishopBishop of [Côtes-du-Nord (Constitutional), France]
28 May 180159.7DiedBishop of [Côtes-du-Nord (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Jacob (VIAF: 5026233)
Bishop Jean-Marie Jacob (born , died ) Bishop of Côtes-du-Nord

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlouézec
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceSaint-Brieuc

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast