Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop François-Antoine Brendel] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Bas-Rhin (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1735Born
6 Mar 179155.4SelectedBishop of [Bas-Rhin (Constitutional), France]
13 Mar 179155.4Ordained BishopBishop of [Bas-Rhin (Constitutional), France]
27 Jun 179761.7ResignedBishop of [Bas-Rhin (Constitutional), France]
22 May 179963.6DiedBishop Emeritus of [Bas-Rhin (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for François-Antoine Brendel (VIAF: 46869582)
Bishop François-Antoine Brendel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bas-Rhin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLohr sur le Main
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceStrasbourg

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast