Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Charrier de La Roche

Deceased

Bishop of Versailles, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1738Born
23 Mar 179152.8SelectedBishop of [Seine-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]
10 Apr 179152.8Ordained BishopBishop of [Seine-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]
26 Oct 179153.4ResignedBishop of [Seine-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]
9 Apr 180263.8SelectedBishop of Versailles, France
9 May 180263.9ConfirmedBishop of Versailles, France
27 May 180264.0InstalledBishop of Versailles, France
17 Mar 182788.8DiedBishop of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Charrier de La Roche (VIAF: 32106628)
Bishop Louis Charrier de La Roche (born , died ) Bishop of Versailles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceVersailles, Diocese of Versailles

  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 394
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Oct 2018

Quantcast