Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Henri Grégoire] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Loir-et-Cher (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1750Born
18 Feb 179140.2SelectedBishop of [Loir-et-Cher (Constitutional), France]
13 Mar 179140.2Ordained BishopBishop of [Loir-et-Cher (Constitutional), France]
28 May 183180.4DiedBishop of [Loir-et-Cher (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Henri Grégoire (VIAF: 88739207)
Bishop Henri Grégoire (born , died ) Bishop of Loir-et-Cher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVého
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Oct 2018

Quantcast