Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Joseph Rigouard] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Var (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1735Born
12 Apr 179155.5SelectedBishop of [Var (Constitutional), France]
22 May 179155.6Ordained BishopBishop of [Var (Constitutional), France]
15 May 180064.6DiedBishop of [Var (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Rigouard (VIAF: 14880878)
Bishop Jean-Joseph Rigouard (born , died ) Bishop of Var

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSollies-Pont
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceSollies-Pont

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast