Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Antoine Adrien Lamourette], C.M. †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Rhône-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1742Born
1769²26.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
2 Mar 179148.7SelectedBishop of [Rhône-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
27 Mar 179148.8Ordained BishopBishop of [Rhône-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
7 Jan 179451.6ResignedBishop of [Rhône-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
11 Jan 179451.6DiedBishop Emeritus of [Rhône-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Adrien Lamourette (VIAF: 3727586)
Bishop Antoine Adrien Lamourette C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rhône-et-Loire

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrévent
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast