Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop François-Xavier Laurent] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Allier, France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1744Born
15 Feb 179146.2SelectedBishop of [Allier, France]
6 Mar 179146.2Ordained BishopBishop of [Allier, France]
1793²48.1ResignedBishop of [Allier, France]
10 May 182176.4DiedBishop Emeritus of [Allier, France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Laurent (VIAF: 27174779)
Bishop François-Xavier Laurent (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Allier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarcenat
Ordained BishopOratorie, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceClermont-Ferrand

  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast