Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop François Marbos] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Drôme (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1739Born
21 Feb 179151.9SelectedBishop of [Drôme (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179152.1Ordained BishopBishop of [Drôme (Constitutional), France]
15 Oct 180162.6ResignedBishop of [Drôme (Constitutional), France]
27 Feb 182586.0DiedBishop Emeritus of [Drôme (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for François Marbos (VIAF: 102591412)
Bishop François Marbos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Drôme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourg les Valence
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceValence

  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Oct 2018

Quantcast