Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Guillaume Tollet] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Nièvre (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1735Born
22 Feb 179155.5SelectedBishop of [Nièvre (Constitutional), France]
27 Mar 179155.6Ordained BishopBishop of [Nièvre (Constitutional), France]
1801²65.3ResignedBishop of [Nièvre (Constitutional), France]
8 Aug 180569.9DiedBishop Emeritus of [Nièvre (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Tollet (VIAF: 76310001)
Bishop Guillaume Tollet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nièvre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoulins-Engilbert
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceVandenesse

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Oct 2018

Quantcast