Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Pierre Thuin] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Seine-et-Marne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1731Born
15 Mar 179160.0SelectedBishop of [Seine-et-Marne (Constitutional), France]
27 Mar 179160.0Ordained BishopBishop of [Seine-et-Marne (Constitutional), France]
1801²69.8ResignedBishop of [Seine-et-Marne (Constitutional), France]
29 Jan 180876.9DiedBishop Emeritus of [Seine-et-Marne (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Thuin (VIAF: 102569439)
Bishop Pierre Thuin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Seine-et-Marne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontereau Faut Yonne
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceMeaux

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast