Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Robert Thomas Lindet] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Eure (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1743Born
15 Feb 179147.2SelectedBishop of [Eure (Constitutional), France]
6 Mar 179147.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Eure (Constitutional), France]
7 Nov 179349.9ResignedBishop of [Eure (Constitutional), France]
10 Aug 182379.7DiedBishop Emeritus of [Eure (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Robert Thomas Lindet (VIAF: 52530529)
Bishop Robert Thomas Lindet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Eure

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBernay
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceBernay

  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast