Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Marie Etrillard, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1900Born
29 Jun 192524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
29 Feb 195655.5AppointedBishop of Daloa, Côte d’Ivoire
31 May 195655.8Ordained BishopBishop of Daloa, Côte d’Ivoire
4 Jul 195655.9AppointedBishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
11 Mar 197170.5ResignedBishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
16 May 197675.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Jean Marie Etrillard
Bishop Jean Marie Etrillard S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gagnoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTemple (Carentoir), France

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast