Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kumasi

Archidioecesis Kumasiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gabriel Justice Yaw Anokye, Archbishop
  • Peter Kwasi Sarpong, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 17 January 2002
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ghana
  • Square Kilometers: 1,865 (720 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kumasicatholic.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box KS 99, Kumasi, Ghana
  • Telephone: 322.085.524

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kumasi
2 February 1932ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} (Kingdom of Ashanti) Vicariate Apostolic of Kumasi (erected)
Diocese of Kumasi
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kumasi Diocese of Kumasi
1 March 1973Territory LostDiocese of Kumasi (Brong Ahafo) Diocese of Sunyani (erected)
3 March 1995Territory LostDiocese of Kumasi (Afígya-Sekyere, Asante-Akim North, Asante-Akim South, Ejisu-Juabeng, Ejura-Sekyedumasi, Kwabre, Sekyere East, and Sekyere West)
Diocese of Sunyani (Sene and Atebubu)
Diocese of Konongo-Mampong (erected)
3 March 1995Territory LostDiocese of Kumasi (Adansi East, Adansi West, Amansie East, Amansie West, and Bosomtwe-Kwanwoma) Diocese of Obuasi (erected)
Archdiocese of Kumasi
17 January 2002ElevatedDiocese of Kumasi Archdiocese of Kumasi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Kumasi
195048,208823,6725.9%124251,9281012ap1951
1970146,0621,697,0538.6%1123344,295233224ap1971
1980227,3551,814,00012.5%2827554,133272424ap1981
1990284,8192,291,00012.4%6623893,200378134ap1991
1999200,0002,089,6839.6%3915543,703176519ap2000
2000200,0002,000,00010.0%4614603,333167219ap2001
2001150,0002,089,6837.2%5613692,173166729ap2002
Archdiocese of Kumasi
2002200,0002,000,00010.0%3614504,0001185834ap2003
2003350,0001,600,00021.9%3712497,1421166234ap2004
2004350,0001,544,26022.7%5918774,545225834ap2005
2013365,1951,823,00020.0%112171292,830619759ap2014
2016378,0471,946,09819.4%130201502,5206810272ap2017
2019398,2942,193,52518.2%119151342,9726811375ap2020
2021404,5512,239,86018.1%132141462,7706211175ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Kumasi
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 294, and Page 295
  • Diocese of Kumasi
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 42, Page 615, to Page 619
  • Archdiocese of Kumasi
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 94, Page 314, and Page 315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024