Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Daloa

Dioecesis Daloaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Maurice Konan Kouassi, Bishop
  • Pierre-Marie Coty, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Gagnoa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Côte d’Ivoire
  • Square Kilometers: 25,000 (9,656 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 710, Daloa, Cote d'Ivoire
  • Telephone: 3278.32.31

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Sassandra
9 April 1940ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio Vicariate Apostolic of Sassandra (erected)
Diocese of Daloa
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sassandra Diocese of Daloa
25 June 1956Territory LostDiocese of Daloa Diocese of Gagnoa (erected)
8 June 1968Territory LostDiocese of Daloa Diocese of Man (erected)
19 December 1994Territory LostDiocese of Daloa
Diocese of Korhogo
Diocese of Man
Diocese of Odienné (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Sassandra
195023,047700,0003.3%32327201316ap1951
Diocese of Daloa
19707,692520,0001.5%22223492237ap1971
198018,979832,0002.3%52126729243612ap1981
199025,5001,203,0002.1%914231,108214613ap1991
199935,5001,115,0003.2%2416408871235313ap2000
200037,0001,200,0003.1%2415399481215313ap2001
200136,5001,193,0003.1%2615418901234813ap2003
200338,0001,200,0003.2%3415497751233714ap2004
200438,0001,196,0003.2%3112438831183414ap2005
200638,0001,196,0003.2%3512478081183414ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 3 Sep 2012