Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile Durrheimer, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Katiola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1909BornBatzendorf, France
8 Jan 193323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
17 Oct 194738.3AppointedPrefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
15 May 195242.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Achelous
15 May 195242.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Katiola, Côte d’Ivoire
16 Aug 195243.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achelous
14 Sep 195546.2AppointedBishop of Katiola, Côte d’Ivoire
7 Jul 197768.0ResignedBishop of Katiola, Côte d’Ivoire
12 Mar 199484.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Katiola, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Emile Durrheimer:
Bishop Emile Durrheimer S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Katiola

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015