Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Gagnoa

Archidioecesis Gagnoaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Yapo Aké, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 December 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Côte d’Ivoire
  • Square Kilometers: 21,951 (8,478 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 527, Gagnoa, Cote d'Ivoire
  • Telephone: 32.772.568
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Gagnoa
25 June 1956ErectedDiocese of Daloa Diocese of Gagnoa (erected)
23 October 1989Territory LostDiocese of Gagnoa Diocese of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire (erected)
Archdiocese of Gagnoa
19 December 1994ElevatedDiocese of Gagnoa Archdiocese of Gagnoa

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Gagnoa
196971,804442,14416.2%483684854474118ap1971
1980111,000987,00011.2%1429432,581366122ap1981
1990102,666750,00013.7%356412,504154517ap1991
Archdiocese of Gagnoa
1999128,0001,157,00011.1%613642,000176126ap2000
2000122,0321,091,04611.2%636691,768165029ap2001
2001127,8871,141,76911.2%657721,776184929ap2002
2004133,9201,362,6949.8%807871,539184930ap2005
2006144,0001,425,00010.1%11221141,263105334ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 22 Feb 2014