Catholic-Hierarchy DC

René-François Cardinal Régnier

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1794Born
19 Dec 181824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Angers, France
24 Jun 184247.9SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
22 Jul 184248.0ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
25 Sep 184248.1Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
4 Oct 184248.2InstalledBishop of Angoulême, France
21 May 185055.8SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
30 Sep 185056.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
22 Dec 187379.4Elevated to Cardinal
4 May 187479.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
3 Jan 188186.4DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for René-François Régnier (VIAF: 12439297)
René-François Cardinal Régnier (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Quentin-les-Beaurepaire

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
  • a cardinal for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 175, and Page 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017